EP2300980 - RECOMMENDER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/14] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUZID, Makram Res. Les Godets Bat. A Rue des Pres F-91120 Palaiseau / FR | 02 /
BONNEFOY, David 18 Rue Paul Fort F-75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
LHUILLIER, Nicolas 59 Avenue des Etats-Unis F-78000 Versailles / FR | 04 /
MERCER, Kevin, C. 15 Field Gardens East Challow Wantage OX12 9SE / GB | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Schley, Jan Malte, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09795047.1 | 07.07.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009US49771 | Priority number, date | US20080171327 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: US 171327 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010005942 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2300980 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06Q30/02 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0282 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | EMPFEHLERSYSTEM | [2011/13] | English: | RECOMMENDER SYSTEM | [2011/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RECOMMANDATION | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 19.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP007905525 [L] 1-10 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [A]KR20030058660 (KT CORP [KR]); | [A]US2004128308 (OBRADOR PERE [US]); | [A]KR20040063150 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.); | [A]US7054849 (PROKOPENKO MIKHAIL [AU], et al) |