EP2373936 - METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR MANUFACTURING DEEP-FROZEN BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZTAS, Cémal 61 Avenue de la Grande Ile F-78960 Voisins Le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
TAMMAR, Moez 64 rue de Velpeau F-92160 Antony / FR | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09795488.7 | 23.11.2009 | WO2009FR52250 | Priority number, date | FR20080058256 | 04.12.2008 Original published format: FR 0858256 | [2011/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010063918 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373936 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/00, B01J2/06, F25D3/10, F25D3/11 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
F25C1/00 (EP);
A23L3/375 (EP);
B01J2/04 (EP);
B01J2/18 (EP);
F25D3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIEFGEFRORENEN KÜGELCHEN | [2011/41] | English: | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR MANUFACTURING DEEP-FROZEN BEADS | [2011/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE BILLES SURGELEES | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 17.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4843840 (GIBSON PETER H [GB]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP0505222 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10012551 (AIR LIQUIDE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0956773 (KANHAI STEVEN [BE]) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph 7 - column 6, paragraph 21; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4420936 (BUSE GASE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0621453 (DU PONT [US] DADE CHEMISTRY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 3 * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 18; figures 1,3 * |