EP2361176 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INFRARED HEATING OF PLASTIC PREFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lize, Grégoire 22 rue Crillon 69006 Lyon / FR | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2011/35] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09795493.7 | 23.11.2009 | WO2009FR52257 | Priority number, date | FR20080006585 | 24.11.2008 Original published format: FR 0806585 | [2011/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010058139 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361176 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2361176 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/64, B29C35/08 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
B29C49/6418 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C49/6465 (EP);
B29C49/6467 (EP);
B29C49/6835 (EP);
B29C49/6855 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INFRAROTERWÄRMUNG VON KUNSTSTOFFVORFORMLINGEN | [2011/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INFRARED HEATING OF PLASTIC PREFORMS | [2011/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INFRAROUGE DE PRÉFORMES PLASTIQUES | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 11.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2009 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | IE | 23.11.2014 | LU | 23.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.11.2009 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.11.2009 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003236922 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]WO2004018114 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 31 - page 2, line 31 *; | [Y]WO2004031671 (ADVANCED PHOTONICS TECH AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 6, line 23 - page 6, line 31 *; | [Y]WO2008109305 (R & D TOOL & ENGINEERING CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0020]; figures 6,10 * |