Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010154867 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 | US62608809 | 25.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012513126 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 | WO2009US68386 | 17.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2367684 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 | WO2009US68386 | 17.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102256784 | 23.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 | WO2009US68386 | 17.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010080469 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2010 | A3 | WO2010080469 | 15.07.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110105822 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201034216 | 16.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US13913908 | 19.12.2008 |