EP2207044 - A SIGNAL PHASE DIFFERENCE MEASUREMENT METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Dawei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TIAN, Yuzhou Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
FENG, Enbo Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Li Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
REN, Xiongwei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/36] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
SUN, Dawei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
TIAN, Yuzhou Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
FENG, Enbo Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
TANG, Li Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
05 /
REN, Xiongwei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/28] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09795678.3 | 08.07.2009 | [2010/28] | WO2009CN72689 | Priority number, date | CN20081171246 | 27.10.2008 Original published format: CN200810171246 | [2010/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010048817 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2207044 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2207044 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03D13/00, G01R27/28, G01R25/00 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H03D13/00 (EP);
G01R25/00 (EP);
G01R27/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | G01R25/00, H03D3/02, H03D13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/28] | G01R25/00, H03D3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINER SIGNALPHASENDIFFERENZ | [2010/28] | English: | A SIGNAL PHASE DIFFERENCE MEASUREMENT METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2010/28] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE DIFFÉRENCE DE PHASE DE SIGNAUX | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | Translation filed | 26.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2009 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.07.2009 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.07.2009 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003057965 (TOYODA SEIJI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1A, 1B *; | [A]US2005111606 (JOSSELSON ROBERT H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0072]; figure 12 * | International search | [X]CN1946071 (NO 54 INST CHINA ELECTRONIC SC [CN]); | [A]CN1010538B (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2008253481 (RIVKIN PAUL D [US], et al); | [A]JPS57200870 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) | by applicant | US2003057965 |