EP2378871 - AQUEOUS FLOWABLE CONCENTRATE COMPOSITIONS OF A MICROENCAPSULATED DINITROANILINE HERBICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANNAN, Terrance, M. 9009 Hometown Drive Raleigh NC 27615 / US | 02 /
KIERKUS, Paul, Ch. 1169 Hidden Hills Drive Wake Forest NC 27517 / US | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/43] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09796713.7 | 18.12.2009 | WO2009EP67520 | Priority number, date | US20080139120P | 19.12.2008 Original published format: US 139120 P | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010070096 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2378871 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2378871 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N33/18, A01N57/20, A01P13/00, A01N25/28 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
A01N33/18 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/28 (KR);
A01N57/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/18, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/18, A01N25/28 (EP,US);
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/20, A01N25/28, A01N33/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | AL | 19.07.2011 | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE FLIESSFÄHIGE KONZENTRAT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN EINES MIKROVERKAPSELTEN DINITROANILINHERBIZIDS | [2012/22] | English: | AQUEOUS FLOWABLE CONCENTRATE COMPOSITIONS OF A MICROENCAPSULATED DINITROANILINE HERBICIDE | [2011/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES CONCENTRÉES ET FLUIDES D'UN HERBICIDE MICROENCAPSULÉ DE TYPE DINITROANILINE | [2012/22] |
Former [2011/43] | WÄSSRIGE FLOWABLE-KONZENTRATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN EINES MIKROVERKAPSELTEN DINITROANILINHERBIZIDS | ||
Former [2011/43] | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES CONCENTRÉES POUVANT S'ÉCOULER D'UN HERBICIDE À LA DINITROANILINE MICROENCAPSULÉE | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 23.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | IE | 18.12.2012 | LU | 18.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2019/29] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
LU | 18.12.2012 | ||
TR | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
LU | 18.12.2012 | ||
TR | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
TR | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 18.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0619073 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 4, line 42 - line 53 * * page 6, line 19 - line 21 *; | [AD]US5705174 (BENOFF BRIAN ERIC [US], et al) [AD] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]WO0030451 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 23, line 25 - page 24, line 31 * | by applicant | US4280833 | US5049182 | US5229122 | US5310721 | EP0619073 | WO9513698 | US5705174 | US5910314 | WO0010392 | EP1109450 | WO0168234 | WO03099005 | - J. ASH, Encyclopedia of Surfactants, CHEMICAL PUBLISHING CO., vol. 1, 3 |