EP2425529 - FILTER WITH IMPROVED IMPEDANCE MATCH TO A HYBRID COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTERSPAUGH, Max, Ward 582 Hadleigh Court Westfield Indiana 46074 / US | 02 /
HUTCHINSON, Daniel, Mark 13790 Laredo Drive Carmel Indiana 46032 / US | 03 /
BOWYER, Andrew, Eric 8767 Shelbyville Road Indianapolis Indiana 46259 / US | 04 /
WHITE, David Glen 5925 Linton Lane Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 05 /
SARAPIN, Alexander 1566 Esprit Drive Carmel, IN 46074 / US | [2012/10] |
Former [N/P] | 01 /
MUTERSPAUGH, Max, Ward 582 Hadleigh Court Westfield Indiana 46074 / US | ||
02 /
HUTCHINSON, Daniel, Mark 13790 Laredo Drive Carmel Indiana 46032 / US | |||
03 /
BOWYER, Andrew, Eric 8767 Shelbyville Road Indianapolis Indiana 46259 / US | Representative(s) | Arnold, Klaus-Peter Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Rittner, Karsten Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 09797207.9 | 21.12.2009 | WO2009US06686 | Priority number, date | US20090172932P | 27.04.2009 Original published format: US 172932 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010126474 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2425529 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/01 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
H03H7/461 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | FILTER MIT VERBESSERTER IMPEDANZANPASSUNG AN EINEN HYBRIDKOPPLER | [2012/10] | English: | FILTER WITH IMPROVED IMPEDANCE MATCH TO A HYBRID COUPLER | [2012/10] | French: | FILTRE DOTÉ D'UNE ADAPTATION D'IMPÉDANCE AMÉLIORÉE AVEC UN COUPLEUR HYBRIDE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3631348 (LEHMANN WILLIAM L) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US4849721 (MATSUURA SYUUJI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0470502 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2815791 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1-18* the whole document * | Examination | US3146409 | US5737461 | US2002166124 | JP2005045547 | US2005283815 | US2005289632 | WO2007046874 |