EP2300243 - DEVICE FOR ATTACHING A ROLLER BEARING TO A SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | DEVICE FOR ATTACHING THE ROLLLING BEARING TO A SHAFT | ||
[2012/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CADDIE B.P no. 47 13, rue de la Mairie 67301 Schiltigheim / FR | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Alice BP n[deg] 47 13 rue de la Mairie F-67301 Schiltigheim Cedex / FR | 02 /
LE MARCHAND, Alain 1 rue de Vendée F-67116 Reichstett / FR | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
JOSEPH, Alice BP n[deg] 47 13 rue de la Mairie F-67301 Schiltigheim Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
LE MARCHAND, Alain 1 rue de Vendée F-67116 Reichstett / FR | Representative(s) | Boutin, Antoine Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Boutin, Antoine Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | ||
Former [2011/13] | Boutin, Antoine Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 09797577.5 | 06.07.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009FR51318 | Priority number, date | FR20080004108 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: FR 0804108 | [2011/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010007293 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300243 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2300243 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B60B33/0002 (EP);
B60B33/001 (EP);
B60B33/0015 (EP);
B60B33/0028 (EP);
F16C35/073 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES KUGELLAGERS AN EINER WELLE | [2011/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR ATTACHING A ROLLER BEARING TO A SHAFT | [2012/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXTION D'UN ROULEMENT A UN AXE | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/13] | DEVICE FOR ATTACHING THE ROLLLING BEARING TO A SHAFT | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2009 | AT | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | GR | 13.06.2012 | HR | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MK | 13.06.2012 | MT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | SM | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | IE | 06.07.2012 | LU | 06.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | NO | 13.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 06.07.2009 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
LU | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MK | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | |
NO | 13.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6588059 (MCCORD ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 35; figure - *; | [AD]WO0007833 (LUIGI PEREGO S R L [IT], et al) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP0837780 (WANZL ENTWICKLUNG GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19619579 (WANZL ENTWICKLUNG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9842523 (WIN WIN INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | WO0007833 | EP0837780 | US6588059 |