EP2321410 - ECT2 ONCOGENE AS A THERAPEUTIC TARGET AND PROGNOSTIC INDICATOR FOR LUNG AND ESOPHAGEAL CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncotherapy Science, Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yusuke c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 02 /
DAIGO, Yataro c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 03 /
TOGASHI, Akira c/o ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC. 2-1 Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09797719.3 | 16.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009JP03360 | Priority number, date | US20080081165P | 16.07.2008 Original published format: US 81165 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010007791 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321410 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | ECT2-ONKOGEN ALS THERAPEUTISCHES ZIELMOLEKÜL UND PROGNOSTISCHER INDIKATOR FÜR LUNGEN- UND SPEISERÖHRENKREBS | [2011/20] | English: | ECT2 ONCOGENE AS A THERAPEUTIC TARGET AND PROGNOSTIC INDICATOR FOR LUNG AND ESOPHAGEAL CANCER | [2011/20] | French: | ONCOGÈNE ECT2 COMME CIBLE THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET INDICATEUR DE PRONOSTIC POUR LE CANCER DU POUMON ET DE L' SOPHAGE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 02.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007013671 (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-8,13,15-17 * page 27; claims 1-18; table 2 * [Y] 14; | [XY]WO2007070621 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8,13-17; | [XY]US2008166729 (KIM BYUNG-CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * claims 1,2,4,6-16; table 2 * [Y] 8,13-17; | [E]EP2105511 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [E] 1,2,4-7,9-16 * page 1 - page 37; claims 1-6; table 2 *; | [XYI] - DIFILIPPANTONIO S ET AL, "Gene expression profiles in human non-small and small-cell lung cancers", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20030901), vol. 39, no. 13, doi:10.1016/S0959-8049(03)00419-2, ISSN 0959-8049, pages 1936 - 1947, XP004446972 [X] 1,2,4-6,9-12 * page 1938; table 1 * * page 1943, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1947, column 1, paragraph 1 * [Y] 8,13-17 [I] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(03)00419-2 | [Y] - SAITO SHIN'ICHI ET AL, "Rho exchange factor ECT2 is induced by growth factors and regulates cytokinesis through the N-terminal cell cycle regulator-related domains.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY 1 NOV 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:14587037, (20031101), vol. 90, no. 4, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 819 - 836, XP002339720 [Y] 9-12 * page 820, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 2 * * page 834, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - KETTUNEN ET AL, "A Broad Amplification Pattern at 3q in Squamous Cell Lung Cancer-A Fluorescence In Situ Hybridization Study", CANCER GENETICS AND CYTOGENETICS, (20000201), vol. 117, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0165-4608(99)00146-6, ISSN 0165-4608, pages 66 - 70, XP055004122 [Y] 9-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-4608(99)00146-6 | [XP] - D. HIRATA ET AL, "Involvement of Epithelial Cell Transforming Sequence-2 Oncoantigen in Lung and Esophageal Cancer Progression", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20090101), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-1672, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 256 - 266, XP055004125 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-1672 | International search | [A]WO2005090603 (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC [JP], et al); | [X]WO2007013671 (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007013665 (ONCOTHERAPY SCIENCE INC [JP], et al); | [X] - MIKI T. ET AL., "Oncogene ect2 is related to regulators of small GTP-binding proteins.", NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, no. 6419, pages 462 - 465, XP002339721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/362462a0 | [X] - CHAN A.M.L. ET AL., "Expression cDNA cloning of a novel oncogene with sequence similarity to regulators of small GTP-binding proteins.", ONCOGENE, (1994), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 1057 - 1063, XP002059291 | [A] - BHATTACHARJEE A. ET AL., "Classification of human lung carcinomas by mRNA expression profiling reveals distinct adenocarcinoma subclasses.", PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI., USA, (2001), vol. 98, no. 24, pages 13790 - 13795, XP003011749 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.191502998 | [A] - KIHARA C. ET AL., "Prediction of Sensitivity of Esophageal Tumors to Adjuvant Chemotherapy by cDNA Microarray Analysis of Gene-Expression Profiles.", CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 6474 - 6479, XP002960719 | [A] - SANO M. ET AL., "Expression level of ECT2 proto-oncogene correlates with prognosis in glioma patients.", ONCOL.REP., (2006), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 1093 - 8, XP008135592 |