EP2311559 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFYING CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2022/19] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRATORI Kazuyuki c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA Masanori c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
WAKAMATSU Hironori c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 04 /
SUGA Katsuo c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2022/19] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
SHIRATORI Kazuyuki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD Intellectuell Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA Masanori c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD Intellectuell Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | |||
03 /
WAKAMATSU Hironori c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD Intellectuell Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | |||
04 /
SUGA Katsuo c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD Intellectuell Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2022/19] |
Former [2011/16] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09797767.2 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009JP60221 | Priority number, date | JP20080185189 | 16.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008185189 | [2011/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010007839 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311559 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2311559 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/63, B01D53/94, B01J23/58, F01N3/10 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
F01N3/2803 (EP,US);
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J21/066 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
B01J37/03 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2061 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2063 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2068 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/30 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9202 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2011/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSKATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2011/16] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFYING CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2011/16] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2011 | Translation filed | 08.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2009 | CY | 11.05.2022 | MK | 11.05.2022 | MT | 11.05.2022 | TR | 11.05.2022 | AT | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | ES | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | IT | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | NL | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | IE | 04.06.2022 | LU | 04.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | FR | 18.07.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | GB | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | DE | 03.01.2023 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
TR | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
IT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GB | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
IT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GB | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
IT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GB | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
IT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GB | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
IT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GB | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GB | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
DE | 03.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 18.07.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
IE | 04.06.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1175935 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [XI]EP1839745 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [I]WO2007119658 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2008004385 (CATALER CORP [JP], et al); | [IP]EP2022562 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al); | [XPI]EP2039426 (CATALER CORP [JP], et al) | International search | [X]JP2002177787 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]WO2007052627 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007111640 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [X]JP2007229641 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | WO2007052627 | JP2008185189 |