EP2321805 - ON DEMAND CONSUMABLE PRODUCT HEATING AND/OR COOLING DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greenbev, Llc. 4780 Adams Road Atlanta, GA 30338 / US | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFISTER, Steve 4780 Adams Road Atlanta GA 30338 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Gray, Peter John Bracey, et al Thompson Gray LLP Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square Falmer Brighton East Sussex BN1 9SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Thompson Gray LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09798338.1 | 20.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009US04220 | Priority number, date | US20080135286P | 18.07.2008 Original published format: US 135286 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010008611 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2321805 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/00, F25B29/00, F25D31/00 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
G07F17/0071 (EP,US);
F25B29/003 (EP,US);
F25D31/007 (EP,US);
G07F17/0078 (EP,US);
F25D2700/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | G07F9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | BEDARFSGESTEUERTE HEIZENDE UND/ODER KÜHLENDE ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBRAUCHSPRODUKTE | [2011/20] | English: | ON DEMAND CONSUMABLE PRODUCT HEATING AND/OR COOLING DISPENSER | [2011/20] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR CHAUFFANT / REFROIDISSANT DE PRODUITS CONSOMMABLES À LA DEMANDE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 28.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2014 | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2008057914 (DRS SUSTAINMENT SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 4] , [0005] , [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 3; | [IAY]EP1684031 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [I] 6,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 15] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027]; figures 3-6 * [A] 1-5,7,13-15 [Y] 8; | [YA]US2001022307 (KAMIMURA ICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * [A] 2,4,5,11; | [YA]EP1811470 (PEPSICO INC [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0065] , [0 69] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076] * [A] 9; | [A]WO0190668 (SCHANIN DAVID J [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 33 * * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 23 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 12 * | International search | [A]US2004255787 (LASSOTA MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [A]US2004249711 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al); | [A]US2003006241 (JOHNSON DAVID K [US]); | [A]US2007233317 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008057914 | EP1684031 |