EP2324425 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BOOTING A BOOTABLE VIRTUAL STORAGE APPLIANCE ON A VIRTUALIZED SERVER PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1621 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERT, Luca 820 Montclaire Drive Cumming GA 30041 / US | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/21] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09798399.3 | 09.06.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009US46702 | Priority number, date | US20080135231P | 17.07.2008 Original published format: US 135231 P | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010008706 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324425 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/44 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/455 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (KR);
G06F9/24 (KR);
G06F9/4411 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45575 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | G06F9/455 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BOOTEN EINES BOOTBAREN VIRTUELLEN SPEICHERGERÄTS AUF EINER VIRTUALISIERTEN SERVERPLATTFORM | [2011/21] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BOOTING A BOOTABLE VIRTUAL STORAGE APPLIANCE ON A VIRTUALIZED SERVER PLATFORM | [2011/21] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT L'INITIALISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE VIRTUEL INITIALISABLE SUR UNE PLATE-FORME DE SERVEUR VIRTUALISÉE | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007234000 (GUJARATHI MANOJ S [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2002178351 (OTT WILLIAM BROOKS [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * | International search | [X]US2006218388 (ZUR URI E [US], et al); | [Y]US2005015430 (ROTHMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [A]US2002103889 (MARKSON THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]US2004177342 (WORLEY WILLIAM S [US]) | by applicant | US2002178351 | US2007234000 |