EP2380024 - ARMET AS A MARKER FOR CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROESSLER, Markus Eichenstrasse 9a 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
KARL, Johann Bert-Schratzlseer-Strasse 7 82380 Peissenberg / DE | 03 /
* * * | 04 /
* * * | 05 /
TACKE, Michael Geisenfelder Strasse 7 80689 München / DE | [2014/21] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
ROESSLER, Markus Eichenstrasse 9a 82110 Germering / DE | ||
02 /
KARL, Johann Bert-Schratzlseer-Strasse 7 82380 Peissenberg / DE | |||
03 /
RIEDLINGER, Julia Kleinstrasse 3 81379 München / DE | |||
04 /
LINDNER, Ingo Herzogstandstrasse 3 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
05 /
TACKE, Michael Geisenfelder Strasse 7 80689 München / DE | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09798890.1 | 18.12.2009 | WO2009EP09159 | Priority number, date | EP20080022238 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08022238 | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072383 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380024 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2380024 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
G01N33/57488 (US);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N2333/475 (US);
G01N2800/52 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARMET ALS KREBSMARKER | [2013/24] | English: | ARMET AS A MARKER FOR CANCER | [2011/43] | French: | ARMET EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR POUR CANCER | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/43] | ARMET ALS MARKER FÜR KREBS | ||
Former [2011/43] | ARMET EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR DU CANCER | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 13.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 18.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2009 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | GR | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | SM | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | IE | 18.12.2014 | LU | 18.12.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.12.2009 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.12.2009 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 18.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004108964 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * In particular: p. 1, l. 8-31; p. 11, l. 4-9 and Fig. 7c; Table 1, p. 37; Table 3, p. 59; claims 9-17. *; | [A] - SHRIDHAR V ET AL, "A GENE FROM HUMAN CHROMOSOMAL BAND 3P21.1 ENCODES A HIGHLY CONSERVED ARGININE-RICH PROTEIN AND IS MUTATED IN RENAL CELL CARCINOMAS", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, (19960502), vol. 12, no. 9, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 1931 - 1938, XP002906046 [A] 17 * the whole document * * In particular: Title and Abstract. * | [X] - SHRIDHAR RAVI ET AL, "Mutations in the arginine-rich protein gene, in lung, breast, and prostate cancers, and in squamous cell carcinoma of the head and neck", CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 56, no. 24, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5576 - 5578, XP002522438 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * In particular: title, abstract, materials and methods and Results section. * | [A] - PIEPOLI ADA ET AL, "Lack of association between UGT1A7, UGT1A9, ARP, SPINK1 and CFTR gene polymorphisms and pancreatic cancer in Italian patients.", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY : WJG 21 OCT 2006, (20061021), vol. 12, no. 39, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 6343 - 6348, XP002522439 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * In particular: Title and abstract. * | [A] - SHRIDHAR VIJI ET AL, "Mutations in the arginine-rich protein gene (ARP) in pancreatic cancer", ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, no. 18, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 2213 - 2216, XP002522440 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * In particular: title and abstract;Table 1 and Fig. 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201054 | [A] - DRACH JOHANNES ET AL, "A cellular proteome map of human multiple myeloma", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200711), Database accession no. PREV200800215384, XP002522442 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [ ] - BLOOD, 49TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; ATLANTA, GA, USA; DECEMBER 08 -11, 2007, (200711), vol. 110, no. 11, Part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 41A | [A] - MIZOBUCHI NAOMI ET AL, "ARMET is a soluble ER protein induced by the unfolded protein response via ERSE-II element", CELL STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION, (2007), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0386-7196, pages 41 - 50, XP002522441 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1247/csf.07001 | by applicant | WO2004057336 | - DUFFY, M.J., CRIT. REV. CLIN. LAB. SCI., (2001), vol. 38, pages 225 - 262 | - AKSOY, S. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 14835 - 14840 | - OKAMURA, A. ET AL., JPN. J. CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 89, pages 649 - 656 | - KASSEM, H. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2002), vol. 101, pages 454 - 460 | - SCHNEIDER, J. ET AL., INT. J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2002), vol. 7, pages 145 - 151 | - SHRIDHAR, V. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1996), vol. 12, pages 1931 - 1939 | - SHRIDHAR, R. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 5576 - 5578 | - SHRIDHAR, V. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, pages 2213 - 2216 | - TANAKA, H. ET AL., ONCOL. REP., (2000), vol. 7, pages 591 - 593 | - MIZOBUCHI, N. ET AL., CELL STRUCT. FUNCT., (2007), vol. 32, pages 41 - 50 | - PETROVA, P. ET AL., J. MOL. NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 20, pages 173 - 188 | - TANAKA, H. ET AL., ONCOL. REP, (2000), vol. 7, pages 591 - 593 | - APOSTOLOU, A. ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (2008), vol. 314, pages 2454 - 2467 | - MOLINA, R. ET AL., TUMOR BIOL., (2003), vol. 24, pages 209 - 218 | - MERLE, P. ET AL., INT. J. OF BIOLOGICAL MARKERS, (2004), vol. 19, pages 310 - 315 | - FUKASAWA, T. ET AL., CANCER & CHEMOTHERAPY, (1986), vol. 13, pages 1862 - 1867 | - WAGNER, H. JR., CHEST, (2000), vol. 117, pages 5110 - 5118 | - BUCCHERI, G. ET AL., ANN. THORAC. SURG., (2003), vol. 75, pages 973 - 980 | - RUCZINSKI, I. ET AL., J. OF COMPUTATIONAL AND GRAPHICAL STATISTICS, (2003), vol. 12, pages 475 - 511 | - FRIEDMAN, J. H., J. OF THE AMERICAN STATISTICAL ASSOCIATION, (1989), vol. 84, pages 165 - 175 | - BREIMAN, L.; RANDOM FORESTS, MACHINE LEARNING, (2001), vol. 45, pages 5 - 32 | - PEPE, M.S., The Statistical Evaluation of Medical Tests for Classification and Prediction, OXFORD STATISTICAL SCIENCE SERIES, (2003), vol. 28 | - ZWEIG, M.H.; CAMPBELL, G., CLIN. CHEM., (1993), vol. 39, pages 561 - 577 |