04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
31.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
22.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.04.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
09.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
19.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|