EP2320963 - A COLLAGEN SCAFFOLD FOR CELL GROWTH AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Western Australia Nedlands Western Australia 6907 / AU | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Ming Hao 2 Kingsland Avenue City Beach Western Australia 6015 / AU | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB Järnvägsgatan 3 252 24 Helsingborg / SE | [2011/20] | Application number, filing date | 09799869.4 | 24.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009AU00946 | Priority number, date | AU20080903789 | 24.07.2008 Original published format: AU 2008903789 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010009511 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320963 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/24, A61K35/32, A61F2/08, A61L27/50 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61K35/32 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61F2/08 (EP,US);
Y10T442/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | KOLLAGENGERÜST FÜR ZELLWACHSTUM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/20] | English: | A COLLAGEN SCAFFOLD FOR CELL GROWTH AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2011/20] | French: | SUPPORT POUR CROISSANCE CELLULAIRE EN COLLAGÈNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 18.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5106949 (KEMP PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 10-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9306791 (ORGANOGENESIS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - GENTLEMAN E ET AL, "Mechanical characterization of collagen fibers and scaffolds for tissue engineering", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20030901), vol. 24, no. 21, doi:10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00206-0, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 3805 - 3813, XP004431161 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00206-0 | [A] - KANNUS P, "Structure of the tendon connective tissue", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE AND SCIENCE IN SPORTS, (200012), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 0905-7188, pages 312 - 320, XP002699782 [A] 10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-0838.2000.010006312.x | International search | [X]US4404033 (STEFFAN WOLFGANG [DE]); | [X]US5171273 (SILVER FREDERICK H [US], et al); | [X]WO9525550 (ORGANOGENESIS INC [US]); | [X]US6361551 (TORGERSON ROBERT D [US], et al); | [X]US2002103503 (TORGERSON ROBERT D [US], et al); | [Y] - RONZIERE, M.C. ET AL., "Ascorbate modulation of bovine chondrocyte growth matrix protein.gene", MEDLINE, Database accession no. 12485803, XP008143857 | [ ] - BIOMATERIALS, (200302), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 851 - 861 | [Y] - ITO, A. ET AL, "Formation of an ascorbate-apatite composite layer on titanium", CAPLUS, Database accession no. 2007:1256007, XP008143850 | [ ] - BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS, BRISTOL, UNITED KINGDOM, (2007), vol. 2, no. 3, pages S181 - S185 |