EP2333141 - CLOTHES DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation 2-9, Suehiro-cho Ome-shi, Tokyo 198-8710 / JP | [2016/41] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Consumer Electronics Holdings Corporation 2-15, Sotokanda 2-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | |||
For all designated states Toshiba Home Appliances Corporation 2-15, Sotokanda 2-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMAKOSHI, Kiyoteru c/o Intellectual Property Division TOSHIBA CORPORATION 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
NISHIWAKI, Satoru c/o Intellectual Property Division TOSHIBA CORPORATION 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
SAKUMA, Tsutomu c/o Intellectual Property Division TOSHIBA CORPORATION 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2021/26] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
UMAKOSHI, Kiyoteru c/o Intellectual Property Division TOSHIBA CORPORATION 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIWAKI, Satoru c/o Intellectual Property Division TOSHIBA CORPORATION 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKUMA, Tsutomu c/o Intellectual Property Division TOSHIBA CORPORATION 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09800195.1 | 17.07.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009JP03379 | Priority number, date | JP20080192153 | 25.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008192153 | [2011/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010010679 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333141 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333141 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/46, D06F58/48, // D06F58/40, D06F58/20, D06F101/20, D06F103/50, D06F105/26 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
D06F58/206 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2101/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/32 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/50 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/26 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/52 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/40 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/46 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/48 (EP,KR,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | D06F58/20, D06F58/28 | ||
Former IPC [2011/24] | D06F25/00, D06F58/02, D06F58/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄSCHETROCKNER | [2011/24] | English: | CLOTHES DRYER | [2011/24] | French: | SÈCHE-LINGE | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2011 | Translation filed | 21.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2021 | 12.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2009 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | IT | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | MT | 30.06.2021 | NL | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | IE | 17.07.2021 | LU | 17.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | FR | 30.08.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | GB | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.07.2009 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GB | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 17.07.2009 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GB | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GB | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GB | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
IT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GB | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 17.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
GB | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 30.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 17.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005217133 (YAKUMARU YUUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0076] ** abstract *; | [A]DE102005041145 (ALPHA INNOTEC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0030] - [0043] * * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2004236965 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007289558 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | JPH05116526 | JP2004236965 | JP2004313765 | JP2006029085 | by applicant | JP2006075217 |