EP2300169 - SPRAYER FOR AT LEAST ONE FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uop LLC 25 East Algonquin Rd. P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Sailesh, B. Uop Riverside P.O. Box 163 Riverside, IL 60546-0163 / US | 02 /
HATAMI, Richard Uop LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 03 /
CRISMYRE, Robert 907 North Knight Park Ridge IL 60068 / US | [2011/18] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
KUMAR, Sailesh, B. Uop Riverside P.O. Box 163 Riverside, IL 60546-0163 / US | ||
02 /
HATAMI, Richard Uop Llc 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | |||
03 /
CRISMYRE, Robert 907 North Knight Park Ridge IL 60068 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09800725.5 | 11.05.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009US43404 | Priority number, date | US20080177793 | 22.07.2008 Original published format: US 177793 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010011393 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300169 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/02, B05B15/00, B01J3/02 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B05B1/265 (EP,US);
B01J8/025 (EP,US);
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
B05B1/18 (EP,US);
B05B15/65 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | SPRÜHKOPF FÜR MINDESTENS EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2011/13] | English: | SPRAYER FOR AT LEAST ONE FLUID | [2011/13] | French: | PULVÉRISATEUR POUR AU MOINS UN FLUIDE | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 05.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1459629 (HENRY JOHNS WILLIAM) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 4 - line 16; figure 3 *; | [XY]US2639947 (HEINRICH TRAMM, et al) [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document * [Y] 10; | [XY]US3603512 (HAM ALEXANDER JAN) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 67; figure - * [Y] 10; | [A]US4140625 (JENSEN ROBERT H) [A] 1 * column 12, line 12 - line 33; figures 13-18 *; | [X]US4159291 (BRUCKERT WALTER [BE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * column 12, line 18 - line 56; figure 5 *; | [E]EP2075056 (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA [BR]) [E] 1* figure - * | International search | [A]US4702879 (TOWER STEPHEN N [US], et al); | [A]US5878955 (AL-HAMLAN SALEH A [SA]); | [A]US5884658 (CAMERON GORDON M [CA]); | [A]US5914255 (GRAE JOEL B [US]) |