EP2307980 - DRIVER INITIATED VEHICLE-TO-VEHICLE ANONYMOUS WARNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom North America Inc. 11 Lafayette Street Lebanon, NH 03766-1445 / US | [2013/17] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Tele Atlas North America, Inc. 11 Lafayette Street Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODWIN, Cecil Wayne, Hilton 1564 Blue Heron Ln. E. Jacksonville Beach FL 32250-8509 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Dobson, Adrian, et al TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Dobson, Adrian, et al TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/15] | Moore, Nicholas TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/15] | Moore, Nicholas TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114 IP Creation 1011 DK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 09800986.3 | 23.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US51490 | Priority number, date | US20080179424 | 24.07.2008 Original published format: US 179424 | US20080086099P | 04.08.2008 Original published format: US 86099 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010011807 | Date: | 28.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307980 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2307980 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G06F15/16, G07C5/00, G07C5/02, G07C5/08 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
G07C5/008 (EP);
G08G1/163 (EP);
G07C5/02 (EP);
G07C5/085 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | G08G1/16, G06F15/16, G07C5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/15] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2011/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRERESEITIG BETÄTIGTE ANONYME WARNVORRICHTUNG ZWISCHEN FAHRZEUGEN | [2011/15] | English: | DRIVER INITIATED VEHICLE-TO-VEHICLE ANONYMOUS WARNING DEVICE | [2011/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AVERTISSEMENT ANONYME DE VÉHICULE À VÉHICULE LANCÉ PAR UN CONDUCTEUR | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 28.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2009 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005222716 (TENGLER STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * figure 11 * * page 1, paragraphs 2-4,8 * * page 2, paragraphs 28,31 * * page 3, paragraphs 32,35,37 * * page 4, paragraphs 56,57,60 * * page 5, paragraphs 64,68 * [Y] 2-4,9,10 [I] 5-8; | [Y]US2002030611 (NUESSER RENE [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3,9,10 * page 2, paragraphs 13,16 * * page 4, paragraphs 44,48 * * page 5, paragraphs 51-53,58 *; | [Y]EP1441321 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 12 *; | [I]EP1291824 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [I] 1,11 * column 1, paragraphs 2,4,6 * * column 4, paragraphs 14,15,17 * * column 6, paragraphs 24,25 * | International search | [X]US2007162550 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]); | [Y] - DELOT ET AL., "Estimating the Relevance of Information in Inter-Vehicle Ad Hoc Networks", MOBILE DATA MANAGEMENT WORKSHOPS, 2008. MDMW 2008. NINTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON,, (20080427), pages 151 - 158, URL: http://www.univ-valenciennes.fr/ROI/SID/tdelot/vespa/vespa_fichiers/EstimatingRelevancelnformation.pdf, XP031449816 | [Y] - YANG ET AL., "Position-based Adaptive Broadcast for Inter-Vehicle Communications", ICC WORKSHOPS '08. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON,, (20080519), pages 410 - 414, URL: http://202.194.20.8/proc/icc2008/DATA/S12S06P08.PDF, XP031265271 |