Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP2320908

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure11.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase24.02.2011National basic fee paid 
24.02.2011Search fee paid 
24.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted25.12.2013
Opposition procedure26.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit published on 03.12.2014 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.05.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20110224
 
Event date:18.05.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:18.05.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:AL BA RS
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07D 498/14 20060101AFI20110922BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/535 20060101ALI20110922BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 31/18 20060101ALI20110922BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20110928
 
Event date:02.11.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:22.08.2012 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20120723
 
Event date:27.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:HAKOGI, TOSHIKAZU
 
Event date:27.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:AOYAMA, YASUNORI
 
Event date:27.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:JOHNS, BRIAN, ALVIN
 
Event date:27.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:WEATHERHEAD, JASON, GORDON
 
Event date:26.06.2013 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:SHIONOGI & CO., LTD.
 
Event date:26.06.2013 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:VIIV HEALTHCARE COMPANY
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:JOHNS, BRIAN, ALVIN
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:HAKOGI, TOSHIKAZU
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20130722
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:AOYAMA, YASUNORI
 
Event date:21.08.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:WEATHERHEAD, JASON, GORDON
 
Event date:25.12.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:31.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 646596 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20140115
 
Event date:25.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:29.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:13.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20140213
 
Event date:22.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0031535000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07D0498140000
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH
 
Event date:10.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20140303
 
Event date:12.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:17.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2448766 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140317
 
Event date:01.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:06.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20140226
 
Event date:28.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION]
Effective DATE:20131225
 
Event date:16.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E009143 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20140312
 
Event date:02.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 16064 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:30.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:05.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T4 E 16064 SK
Code Expl.: CORRECTED SLOVAK TRANSLATION OF A EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
 
Event date:29.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E020489 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20140926
 
Event date:26.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:08.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20140926
 
Event date:25.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:28.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4B E020489 HU
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF THE CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:22.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20140400515 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20140416
 
Event date:21.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:21.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:24.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:KRAUS & WEISERT PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE
 
Event date:27.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO CHAD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE OWNER'S NAME OR ADDRESS (PAR. 44 PATENT LAW, PAR. PATENTFORSKRIFTEN)
OWNER:VIIV HEALTHCARE COMPANY, US
 
Event date:24.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:VIIV HEALTHCARE COMPANY, WILMINGTON, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: SHIONOGI & CO., LTD., OSAKA, JP; VIIV HEALTHCARE CO., RESEARCH TRIANGLE PARK, US
 
Event date:24.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602009021042 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:SHIONOGI & CO., LTD., JP
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: SHIONOGI & CO., LTD., OSAKA, JP; VIIV HEALTHCARE CO., RESEARCH TRIANGLE PARK, US
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:03.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Effective DATE:20180704
 
Event date:20.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS
OWNER:SHIONOGI CO. LTD; JP
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SHIONOGI CO. LTD.
Effective DATE:20180110
 
Event date:20.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS
OWNER:SHIONOGI & CO. LTD; JP
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SHIONOGI & CO. LTD.
Effective DATE:20180110
 
Event date:11.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:11.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:26.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20190711
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:01.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T2IS P20140223 HR
Code Expl.: CORRECTION OF THE TRANSLATIONS OF THE CLAIMS
 
Event date:07.08.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20200722
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:22.11.2013 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:15.11.2013 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:22.07.2013 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:25.02.2013 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:15.04.2011 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:20.08.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20210716
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:02.09.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20220720
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:14.06.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230331
 
Event date:04.08.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20230719
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:29.03.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20230622
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:01.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:05.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20240620
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:08.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20240620
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:09.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:11.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:11.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20240621
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:15.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:15.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20240620
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:18.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:23.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20240625
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:29.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20240627
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20240620
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:01.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20240621
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:01.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20240625
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:02.08.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20140223 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20240709
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20240626
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.09.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:08.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20240702
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20240709
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240619
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:21.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20240802
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:21.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20240801
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:24.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20240620
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20240709
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20240627
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20240719
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20240701
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20240620
Year of Fee Payment:16