EP2371138 - RECONSTRUCTION OF DE-INTERLEAVED VIEWS, USING ADAPTIVE INTERPOLATION BASED ON DISPARITY BETWEEN THE VIEWS FOR UP-SAMPLING. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103-4813 / US | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAHALAWATTA, Peshala, V. 3601 West Alameda Avenue Burbank California 91505-5300 / US | 02 /
TOURAPIS, Alexandros 939 Coventry Circle Milpitas California 95035 / US | 03 /
LEONTARIS, Athanasios 3601 West Alameda Avenue Burbank California 91505-5300 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09801358.4 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009US69132 | Priority number, date | US20080140886P | 25.12.2008 Original published format: US 140886 P | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010075346 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371138 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371138 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | REKONSTRUKTION VON ENTSCHACHTELTEN ANSICHTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ADAPTIVER INTERPOLATION AUF DER BASIS VON UNGLEICHHEIT ZWISCHEN DEN ANSICHTEN FÜR AUFWÄRTSABTASTUNG | [2011/40] | English: | RECONSTRUCTION OF DE-INTERLEAVED VIEWS, USING ADAPTIVE INTERPOLATION BASED ON DISPARITY BETWEEN THE VIEWS FOR UP-SAMPLING. | [2011/40] | French: | RECONSTRUCTION DE VUES DÉSENTRELACÉES, À L'AIDE D'UNE INTERPOLATION ADAPTATIVE BASÉE SUR UNE DISPARITÉ ENTRE LES VUES POUR UN SUR-ÉCHANTILLONNAGE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 13.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2009 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | SM | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | IE | 22.12.2012 | LU | 22.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/36] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
LU | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 24.10.2012 | ||
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
LU | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
SM | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
LU | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | |
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2006082574 (TSUBAKI HIDETOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0074] - [0077]; figures 3-5,7 * * paragraphs [0087] - [0097]; figure 22 *; | [XA]US2005117637 (ROUTHIER NICHOLAS [CA], et al) [X] 16 * paragraphs [0023] , [0028]; figures 5-6 * [A] 1-15,17-19; | [IA]US2008303892 (KIM YONG-TAE [KR], et al) [I] 1,16-19 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0091] - [0104]; figure 5a * * paragraphs [0105] - [0121]; figure 5b * [A] 3,5-7,9-12 | by applicant | US2006082574 |