EP2370295 - DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM AND DIAGNOSTIC METHOD FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO, Tomoya c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Koichi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 09801775.9 | 23.12.2009 | WO2009IB07874 | Priority number, date | JP20080329685 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008329685 | JP20090070713 | 23.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009070713 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073111 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2370295 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2370295 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/023, G07C5/08 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
B60R16/0232 (EP,US);
B60R16/0236 (EP,US);
Y02T10/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSESYSTEM UND DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2011/40] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM AND DIAGNOSTIC METHOD FOR VEHICLE | [2011/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR VÉHICULE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 25.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | HR | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | IT | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MK | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | SM | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | IE | 23.12.2012 | LU | 23.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | NO | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/32] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
LU | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
LU | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
LU | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
NO | 14.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2125578 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]GB2217029 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]EP1253415 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2004008109 (ENDOH KAZUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [A]DE102006055451 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]GB2448601 (WUNELLI LTD [GB]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 13 - page 8, line 25; figures 1-2 * * abstract * | by applicant | JPH01290967 | JP2004060548 | JP2006118480 | JP2006183506 |