EP2371119 - RIDGE-BASED COLOR GAMUT MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650 / US | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUO, Chung-Hui 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
TAI, Hwai-Tzuu 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 03 /
LAI, Di 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/16] |
Former [2011/40] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09802238.7 | 21.12.2009 | WO2009US06610 | Priority number, date | US20080317552 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: US 317552 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010074729 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371119 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H04N1/6058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FARBPALLETTENABBILDUNG AUF RIDGE-BASIS | [2011/40] | English: | RIDGE-BASED COLOR GAMUT MAPPING | [2011/40] | French: | MAPPAGE D'UNE GAMME DE COULEURS SUR LA BASE DE RANGÉES | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 14.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0611230 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5574666 (RUETZ BRIGITTE [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0800150 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2007279714 (HIGASHIKATA RYOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] *; | [I]US2007296988 (TSUJI TETSUYA [JP]) [I] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0064] *; | [A]EP1892949 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [IP]US2009122371 (IWAFUCHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [IP] 1,15* the whole document *; | [A] - HUNG P-C ET AL, "DETERMINATION OF CONSTANT HUE LOCI FOR A CRT GAMUT AND THEIR PREDICTIONS USING COLOR APPEARANCE SPACES", COLOR RESEARCH AND APPLICATION, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC. NEW YORK, US, (19951001), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 0361-2317, pages 285 - 295, XP000565204 [A] 1 | [A] - MOROVIC J ET AL, "THE FUNDAMENTALS OF GAMUT MAPPING: A SURVEY", JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SOCIETY OF IMAGING SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (20010501), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 1062-3701, pages 283 - 290, XP008017721 [A] 1 |