EP2321495 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR GAS PRODUCTION FROM A RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profero Energy Inc. 130, 3553-31st Street NW Calgary, Alberta T2L 2K7 / CA | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATES, Ian, Donald 90 Arbour Lake Drive NW Calgary Alberta T3G 4N7 / CA | 02 /
ADAMS, Jennifer, Jane 216, 3730-50 St. NW Calgary Alberta T3A 2V9 / CA | 03 /
LARTER, Stephen, Richard 92 Edenwold Cr. NW Calgary Alberta T3A 3T6 / CA | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Mark, et al Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Gibson, Mark, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
Former [2013/07] | Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Taylor House 39 High Street GB-Marlow, Bucks SL7 1AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09802319.5 | 31.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009CA01069 | Priority number, date | CA20082638451 | 01.08.2008 Original published format: CA 2638451 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010012093 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321495 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/22, C12P1/00, C12P3/00, C12P5/02 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
E21B43/16 (EP,US);
C09K8/582 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP,US);
C12M41/34 (EP,US);
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR GASPRODUKTION AUS EINEM RESERVOIR | [2011/20] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR GAS PRODUCTION FROM A RESERVOIR | [2011/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR UNE PRODUCTION DE GAZ À PARTIR D'UN RÉSERVOIR | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 15.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 25.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008041990 (GROUNDWATER SERVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-15 * page 18, line 10 - line 17; claim 1 * [I] 4,9; | [X]US2004033557 (SCOTT ANDREW R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0058] , [0054]; examples 1,4; claims 1,9 *; | [X]US2001045279 (CONVERSE DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10-15 * paragraph [0028]; example 1; claims 1,11,17 *; | [XD]US2007251146 (LARTER STEPHEN R [CA], et al) [XD] 1,2,5-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0107] , [0108] , [0112] , [0113]; example 1; claims 1,14 *; | [XD]US2007298479 (LARTER STEPHEN R [CA], et al) [XD] 1,5-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0040]; claims 1,14 *; | [A] - R.J. PALLASSER, "Recognising biodegradation in gas/oil accumulations through the d13C compositions of gas components", ORG. GEOCHEM., (20001231), vol. 31, pages 1363 - 1373, XP002684043 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0146-6380(00)00101-7 | International search | [X]WO0168904 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US]); | [X]WO2005115649 (UNIV NEWCASTLE [GB], et al); | [Y] - LI ET AL., "Critical Gas Saturation: Modelling and Sensitivity Studies", SPE Annual Technical Conference and Exhibition, 3-6 October 1993, Houston, Texas, XP008144304 |