EP2321327 - ZWITTERIONIC PHOSPHONIUM SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning / McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street, West Montréal, Québec H3A 2T5 / CA | For all designated states The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Room R1007, 10/F Shirley Chan Building Hung Hom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning / McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street, West Montreal, Québec H3A 2T5 / CA | ||
For all designated states The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Room R1007, 10/F Shirley Chan Building Hung Hom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Tak-Hang 33 Harbour Square Apt. 2433 Toronto, Ontario M5J 2G2 / CA | 02 /
HUO, Congde 3494 Jeanne Mance Street, 509 Montreal Quebec H2X 2K1 / CA | 03 /
HE, Xun 317 Sheringham Drive Hockessin DE 19707 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09802322.9 | 29.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009CA01074 | Priority number, date | US20080084360P | 29.07.2008 Original published format: US 84360 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010012096 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321327 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/54, C07C1/207, C07C41/56 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C07F9/5325 (EP,US);
C07C1/324 (EP,US);
C07C41/30 (EP,US);
C07C41/56 (EP,US);
C07F9/5022 (EP,US);
C07F9/5442 (EP,US);
C07F9/5456 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/324, C07C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C41/30, C07C43/215 (US,EP);
C07C41/56, C07C43/307 (US,EP);
C07C41/56, C07C43/313 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | ZWITTERIONISCHE PHOSPHONIUMSALZE | [2011/20] | English: | ZWITTERIONIC PHOSPHONIUM SALTS | [2011/20] | French: | SELS DE PHOSPHONIUM ZWITTERIONIQUES | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 15.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]CA2378877 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [X] - LOU, Z ET AL., "Synthesis and Antitumor Activities of Sulfonated Triphenylphosphoniums", CHINESE JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 168 - 171, XP008143174 | [X] - DEHMLOW, EV ET AL., "Applications of Phase Transfer Catalysis. Part 17. Wittig Reactions in Various Two-Phase Systems", J. CHEM. RESEARCH (S), (1981), page 142, XP008143175 | [X] - WANG, Q ET AL., "The Simultaneous In-Situ Generation of Aldehydes and Phosphorus Ylides: A Conveninent Muli-Step One-Pot Olefination Protocol.", EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (1999), pages 3263 - 3268, XP008143181 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0690(199912)1999:12<3263::AID-EJOC3263>3.0.CO;2-U | [X] - MISUMI, S ET AL., "Altemant Conjugate Systems II. Syntheses of Stereoisomeric p-Distyrylbenzenes and Related Compounds", BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1961), vol. 34, no. 21, pages 1833 - 1837, XP008143184 | [X] - OKUMA, K ET AL., "Wittig Reaction by Using DBU as a Base", BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (2003), vol. 76, pages 1675 - 1676, XP008143268 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.76.1675 | [X] - HARROWVEN, DC ET AL., "The Synthesis of a Combretastatin A-4 Based Library and Discovery of New Cooperative ortho-Effects in Wittig Reactions Leading to (Z)-Sitlbenes", SYNLETT, (2006), vol. 18, pages 2977 - 2980, XP008143183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-948200 | [X] - HWANG, JJ ET AL., "Study of the Wittig reaction of benzyltriphenylphosphonium salt and benzaldehyde via ylide-mediated phase-transfer catalysis Substituent and solvent effects", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (1999), vol. 142, pages 125 - 139, XP008143179 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1169(98)00274-X | [X] - FLYNN, RM ET AL., "Synthetic and mechanistic aspects of the reactions between bromodifluoromethyltriphenylphosphonium bromide and dibromofluoromethyltriphenylphosphonium bromide and trialkylphosphites", JOURNAL OFFLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 129, pages 583 - 589, XP008143185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfluchem.2008.04.003 | [X] - WANG, X ET AL., "Catalytic cyanosilylation of ketones with simple phosphonium salt", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2007), vol. 48, pages 6010 - 6013, XP022169114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2007.06.132 | [X] - JOHNSON, CL ET AL., "Novel application of phosphonium salts as co-catalysts for the Baylis-Hillman reaction", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2004), vol. 45, pages 7359 - 7361, XP004559002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2004.07.155 | [X] - WAKABAYASHI, T ET AL., "Hydration of Quaternary Phosphonium Bromides, BU4-nPhnPBr, in Chloroform", BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1981), vol. 54, pages 951 - 956, XP008143186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.54.951 | [XP] - HUO, C ET AL., "Carbon Tetrabromide / Sodium Triphenylphosphine-m-sulfonate (TPPMS) as an Efficient and Easily Recoverable Catalyst for Acetalization and Tetrahydropyranylation Reactions", ADV. SYNTH. CATAL., (20090716), vol. 351, pages 1933 - 1938, XP008143187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adsc.200900102 | [XP] - HUO, C ET AL., "Zwitterionic Phosphonium Sulfonates as Easily Phase-Separable Ion-Tagged Wittig Reagents", J. ORG. CHEM., (20080927), vol. 73, pages 8583 - 8586, XP008143188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo801418a |