EP2310860 - BLOOD GLUTATHIONE AS A BIOMARKER FOR SCREENING ASYMPTOMATIC PATIENTS AT RISK FOR HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMY, Thibaud U955 INSERM Institut Mondor de Recherche Biomédicale Hôpital Henri Mondor 51 Avenue du Maréchal De Lattre De Tassigny F-94010 Créteil / FR | 02 /
LE CORVOISIER, Philippe U955 INSERM Institut Mondor de Recherche Biomédicale Hôpital Henri Mondor 51 Avenue du Maréchal De Lattre De Tassigny F-94010 Créteil / FR | 03 /
PAVOINE, Catherine U955 INSERM Institut Mondor de Recherche Biomédicale Hôpital Henri Mondor 51 Avenue du Maréchal De Lattre De Tassigny F-94010 Créteil / FR | 04 /
PECKER, Françoise U955 INSERM Institut Mondor de Recherche Biomédicale Hôpital Henri Mondor 51 Avenue du Maréchal De Lattre De Tassigny F-94010 Créteil / FR | 05 /
CARAMELLE, Philippe U955 INSERM Institut Mondor de Recherche Biomédicale Hôpital Henri Mondor 51 Avenue du Maréchal De Lattre De Tassigny F-94010 Créteil / FR | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09802484.7 | 17.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP59242 | Priority number, date | EP20080305438 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08305438 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010012616 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310860 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/53 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61P9/04 (EP);
G01N2800/325 (EP,US);
G01N2800/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | BLUTGLUTATHION ALS BIOMARKER ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG ASYMPTOMATISCHER HERZINFARKT-GEFÄHRDETER PATIENTEN | [2011/16] | English: | BLOOD GLUTATHIONE AS A BIOMARKER FOR SCREENING ASYMPTOMATIC PATIENTS AT RISK FOR HEART FAILURE | [2011/16] | French: | GLUTATHION SANGUIN COMME BIOMARQUEUR POUR LE DÉPISTAGE DE PATIENTS ASYMPTOMATIQUES PRÉSENTANT UN RISQUE D'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2005046675 (HOLTZMAN JORDAN [US]) [I] 9 * page 1, lines 31-34; page 2, lines 1-5; page 2, lines 26-34; page 3, lines 1-6; page 22, claim 1 *; | [XY]US2005202521 (CRUM ALBERT [US]) [X] 5 * paragraphs 0001, 0013-0019,0313-0314, 0210-0211; claim 1. *[Y] 1-4,6-8; | [Y]US2006105419 (BLANKENBERG STEFAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs 0002, 0004, 0005, 0010, 0011, 0021-0024, 0030, 0031, 0040-0053, 0057, 0070-0075, 0077; page 17, claims 1-6, 13-22, 26, 27. *; | [IDY] - ADAMY ET AL, "Neutral sphingomyelinase inhibition participates to the benefits of N-acetylcysteine treatment in post-myocardial infarction failing heart rats", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, GB, (20070827), vol. 43, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2828, pages 344 - 353, XP022214894 [ID] 9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4,6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yjmcc.2007.06.010 | [Y] - NIELSEN OLAV W ET AL, "Retrospective analysis of the cost-effectiveness of using plasma brain natriuretic peptide in screening for left ventricular systolic dysfunction in the general population.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY 1 JAN 2003, (20030101), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0735-1097, pages 113 - 120, XP002503275 [Y] 2,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0735-1097(02)02625-6 | [Y] - AL-MALLAH MOUAZ ET AL, "POSITIVE TROPONIN IN DIABETIC KETOACIDOSIS WITHOUT ACUTE CORONARY SYNDROME PREDICTS POOR OUTCOME", CIRCULATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, DALLAS, TX, (20041001), vol. 110, no. 17, SUPPL.S, ISSN 0009-7322, page 413(ABSTRACT1948), XP008069195 [Y] 2,6 * the whole document * | [Y] - SHARMA RAKESH ET AL, "Elevated circulating levels of inflammatory cytokines and bacterial endotoxin in adults with congenital heart disease.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY 15 JUL 2003, (20030715), vol. 92, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9149, pages 188 - 193, XP002503276 [Y] 2-3,6-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9149(03)00536-8 | [Y] - RAUCHHAUS M ET AL, "Plasma cytokine parameters and mortality in patients with chronic heart failure.", CIRCULATION 19 DEC 2000, (20001219), vol. 102, no. 25, ISSN 1524-4539, pages 3060 - 3067, XP002503277 [Y] 2-3,6-7 * the whole document * | [XY] - BIOVISION, INC, "ApoGSH tm Glutathione Fluorometric/Colormetric Assays", PRODUCT INFO, (20070304), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070304054209/http://www.biovision.com/updated/gluthathione.html, (20090921), XP002546616 [X] 5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-7 |