EP2318123 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN UREA SOLUTION FOR USE IN AN SCR PROCESS FOR REDUCTION OF NOx [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/19] | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A UREA SOLUTION FOR USE IN SCR PROCESS FOR REDUCTION OF NOx | ||
[2011/32] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASALE SA Via Giulio Pocobelli 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2014/52] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Urea Casale S.A. Via Guillo Pocobelli 6 6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZARDI, Federico Via Lucino 60 CH-6932 Breganzona / CH | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2011/19] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 09802489.6 | 21.07.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009EP59388 | Priority number, date | EP20080013743 | 31.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08013743 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010012632 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2318123 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2318123 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/79, B01D53/90, C07C273/16 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
C07C273/16 (EP,US);
B01J31/0249 (US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SCR-PROZESS ZUR NOX-VERRINGERUNG | [2014/25] | English: | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN UREA SOLUTION FOR USE IN AN SCR PROCESS FOR REDUCTION OF NOx | [2011/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE SOLUTION D'URÉE À UTILISER DANS LE PROCÉDÉ SCR POUR LA RÉDUCTION DE NOX | [2014/25] |
Former [2011/19] | VERFAHREN UND PFLANZE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SCR-VERFAHREN ZUR NOx-VERRINGERUNG | ||
Former [2011/19] | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A UREA SOLUTION FOR USE IN SCR PROCESS FOR REDUCTION OF NOx | ||
Former [2011/19] | PROCÉDÉ ET USINE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SOLUTION D'URÉE UTILISABLE DANS LE CADRE D'UN PROCÉDÉ SCR DE RÉDUCTION DES NOx | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 26.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Bülle, Jan Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | 02
30.08.2012
07.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Bülle, Jan Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
02
30.08.2012
07.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2014/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Bülle, Jan Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
02
30.08.2012
07.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2014/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE Opponent's representative Bülle, Jan Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
02
30.08.2012
07.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2014/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
02
30.08.2012
07.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2013/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 44141 Dortmund / DE | ||
02
30.08.2012
07.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2012/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2012
03.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 44141 Dortmund / DE | ||
02
30.08.2012
Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 2 6135KW Sittard / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus Vereenigde N.V. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 09.10.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.04.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.08.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/45] | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 16.07.2014 | Appeal received No. T1575/14 | 09.10.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.08.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 06.08.2014 | Appeal received No. T1575/14 | 18.08.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 30.07.2014 | Appeal received No. T1575/14 | 18.08.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 18.08.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2009 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | HR | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MK | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | SM | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | NO | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | IE | 21.07.2012 | LU | 21.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | GB | 21.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
SM | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
LU | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GB | 21.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GB | 21.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO2006096048 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [DX] 1,8,12* the whole document * |