EP2307599 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF TWISTING AND HEAT-SETTING YARN, AND APPARATUS FOR TWISTING YARN AND HEAT-SETTING YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Kreuzackerstrasse 9 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Pestalozzistrasse 2 9000 St. Gallen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANAHL, Peter 538 Indian Mound Road Ringgold GA 30736 / US | 02 /
RITTENHOUSE, Ronnie 464 Fire Tower Road, Ne Calhoun GA 30701 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09803368.1 | 16.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US50778 | Priority number, date | US20080084710P | 30.07.2008 Original published format: US 84710 P | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/15] | US20080084720P | 30.07.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010014411 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2307599 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/28 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
D02G3/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | D02G1/04, D02G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR WICKLUNG UND THERMOFIXIERUNG EINES GARNS SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR WICKLUNG UND THERMOFIXIERUNG EINES GARNS | [2011/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF TWISTING AND HEAT-SETTING YARN, AND APPARATUS FOR TWISTING YARN AND HEAT-SETTING YARN | [2011/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TORDAGE ET DE THERMOFIXAGE D'UN FIL, ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT LE TORDAGE D'UN FIL ET LE THERMOFIXAGE D'UN FIL | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 02.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007095043 (PUAUX BERNARD [FR]) [X] 14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]US5950412 (GABALDA CARLOS MATAS [FR] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * figures 2, 6, 7 * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 30 * * examples 1, 2 *; | [A]EP1645667 (PERFORMANCE FIBERS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 4 *; | [A]US3820316 (CLARKSON R) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 14 *; | [A]JP2005330600 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]EP0581439 (RIETER SCRAGG LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0899366 (BELMONT TEXTIL MACH INC [US]); | [A]JP2003286618 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) | by applicant | US5950412 | US2007095043 |