EP2306924 - INTERDENTAL CLEANERS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunstar Suisse, S.A. Route de Pallatex 15 1163 Etoy / CH | [2011/22] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Sunstar Americas, Inc. 4635 West Foster Avenue Chicago, IL 60630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALBFELD, Russell, G. 1945 Sprucewood Court Naperville IL 60565 / US | 02 /
GONZALEZ, Leoncio, Angel 0 North 240 Leonard Street Winfield IL 60190 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Stafford, Jonathan Alan Lewis, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2016/36] |
Former [2013/20] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/38] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09803491.1 | 28.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US51979 | Priority number, date | US20080084573P | 29.07.2008 Original published format: US 84573 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010014623 | Date: | 04.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306924 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306924 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61C15/02, A46B1/00 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A46B1/00 (EP,US);
A61C15/02 (EP,US);
A46B2200/108 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | A61C15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2011/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZAHNZWISCHENRAUMREINIGER UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2011/15] | English: | INTERDENTAL CLEANERS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | [2011/15] | French: | NETTOYEURS INTER-DENTAIRES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 01.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2009 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.07.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.07.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.07.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0215814 (HILL IRA D [US]) [I] 1,4,8,11,14,15 * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 2 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 10 *; | [I]US5246021 (KATZ HARRY S [US]) [I] 1-3,5,6,8-12,14,15 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 17; figures 2, 3 *; | [A]US3590814 (BENNETT BAILEY, et al) [A] 1,8,14 * column 5, line 70 - column 6, line 15 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 4 *; | [A]US4974615 (DOUNDOULAKIS GEORGE J [US]) [A] 1,8,14 * column 3, lines 35-41; figures 1, 6 * * column 4, lines 33-48 * * column 5, lines 21-36 *; | [A]US5392794 (STRIEBEL JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,7,8,13-15 * column 7, lines 24-66 * * column 7, lines 3-7 * * column 6, lines 58-64; claims 11, 12 *; | [AP]EP1972305 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [AP] 1,3,6,8,9,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027] * | International search | [X]US6220258 (BRIGGS ROBERT B [US], et al); | [Y]US5987688 (ROBERTS MICHAEL F [US], et al); | [Y]US2004164454 (GARTSTEIN VLADIMIR [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0215814 |