EP2231003 - TECHNIQUES FOR EVALUATING STRESS URINARY INCONTINENCE (SUI) USING INVOLUNTARY REFLEX COUGH TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pneumoflex Systems L.L.C. 101 E. Florida Avenue Melbourne, FL 32901 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addington, Robert 490 Spoonbill Lane Melbourne Beach, Florida 32951 / US | 02 /
Stephens, Robert 8133 NW Walnut Way Parkville, Missouri 64152 / US | 03 /
Phelipa, Michael 2470 Turtle Mound Road Melbourne, Florida 32934 / US | 04 /
Briganti, Mary 5785 Newbury Circle Melbourne, Florida 32940 / US | 05 /
Miller, Stuart 705 Atlantic Street Melbourn Beach, Florida 32951 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09803960.5 | 21.12.2009 | [2010/39] | WO2009US68973 | Priority number, date | US20080139649P | 22.12.2008 Original published format: US 139649 P | US20090244167P | 21.09.2009 Original published format: US 244167 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010075274 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231003 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231003 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/03, A61B5/20, A61B5/0488 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/202 (EP);
A61B5/395 (US);
A61B5/0823 (EP);
A61B5/205 (EP);
A61B5/389 (EP);
A61B5/6852 (EP);
A61B5/6874 (EP);
A61M25/00 (EP);
A61B5/4047 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG STRESSBEDINGTER HARNINKONTINENZ DURCH UNTERSUCHUNG UNFREIWILLIGEN REFLEXHUSTENS | [2010/39] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR EVALUATING STRESS URINARY INCONTINENCE (SUI) USING INVOLUNTARY REFLEX COUGH TEST | [2010/39] | French: | TECHNIQUES POUR ÉVALUER UNE INCONTINENCE D'URINE À L'EFFORT À L'AIDE D'UN TEST DE TOUX RÉFLEXE INVOLONTAIRE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 31.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2009 | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | ES | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | IT | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 28.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004073516 (PNEUMOFLEX SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,16,23* abstract *; | [IY]US2005038328 (STOEHRER MANFRED [DE], et al) [I] 23-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0015] , [0025] , [0026] , [0052] - [0057] - [0105] , [0106] , [0123] , [0124] * [Y] 16-22,25-27; | [A]US2005059900 (BERGER YITZHAK [US], et al) [A] 1,9,16,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] *; | [XAY]WO2007079271 (PNEUMOFLEX SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 9 * abstract * * page 5, lines 10-30 * * page 6, lines 1-14; figure 4 * * page 10, lines 1-12 * [A] 1-4,14-15 [Y] 16-18; | [YA] - W ROBERT ADDINGTON, R E STEPPHENS, M M PHELIPA, J G WIDDICOMBE, RR OCKEY, "Intra-abdominal pressures during voluntary and reflex cough", COUGH, (20080430), vol. 4, pages 1 - 9, XP002573766 [Y] 16-22,25-27 * abstract * * sections "Materials and methods", "analysis of AIP" * [A] 1-4,9,14-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1745-9974-4-2 | [A] - DAN LASSERSON ET AL, "Differences in motor activation of voluntary and reflex cough in humans", THORAX, BMJ PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20060406), vol. 61, no. 8, ISSN 0040-6376, pages 699 - 705, XP009131047 [A] 1,9,16,23 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004073516 | US2005038328 | US2005059900 | WO2007079271 | - ADDINGTON ET AL., COUGH, (20080430), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 1 - 9 | - Thorax, BMJ PUBLISHING GROUP, (20060406), vol. 61, pages 699 - 705 |