EP2316227 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INCORPORATING MULTIMEDIA CONTENT INTO A MESSAGE HANDLED BY A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Research in Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORMALD, Christopher R. 72876 - 300 Hagey Blvd. Waterloo Ontario N2L 0A4 / CA | 02 /
MALLICK, Martyn H. 71396 - 300 Hagey Blvd. Waterloo Ontario N2L 0A4 / CA | 03 /
BALSILLIE, James L. 176 Coumbia Street W. Waterloo Ontario N2L 3L3 / CA | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Electronics 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09804413.4 | 22.07.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009CA01008 | Priority number, date | US20080087013P | 07.08.2008 Original published format: US 87013 P | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015071 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316227 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, H04W4/12, H04W88/02 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04L51/063 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L65/1089 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | H04W4/12, G06Q30/00, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION VON MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN IN EINE VON EINEM MOBILGERÄT VERWALTETE NACHRICHT | [2011/18] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INCORPORATING MULTIMEDIA CONTENT INTO A MESSAGE HANDLED BY A MOBILE DEVICE | [2011/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INCORPORATION DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA DANS UN MESSAGE GÉRÉ PAR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 14.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005289113 (BOOKSTAFF BLAKE [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007088851 (LEVKOVITZ ZOHAR [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 7 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0204] * * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0226] * | International search | [X]WO2008024690 (SALINAS ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]WO2008091179 (OBCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOI OTVE [RU], et al); | [A]US2007266403 (OU CANHUI [US], et al); | [A]US2006286989 (ILLION BRIAN E B [CA]) | by applicant | US2005289113 | US2007088851 |