EP2323829 - Process for fastening an accessory to a plastic hollow body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/21] | PROCESS FOR FASTENING AN ACCESSORY TO A PLASTIC HOLLOW BODY | ||
[2012/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (Société Anonyme) Rue de Ransbeek 310 1120 Brussels / BE | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANNOT, Frédéric Rue du Fond des Bois 9 B-1470 Bousval / BE | 02 /
CRIEL, Bjorn Steenbergstraat 11A B-1750 Sint-Martens-Lennik / BE | 03 /
TARDY, Pierre-François 12 avenue de la Nivéole B-1020 Brussels / BE | 04 /
POHLMANN, Ralph 169 rue du Petit Parc F-60280 Margny-lès-Compiègne / FR | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/21] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 09804576.8 | 06.08.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009EP60198 | Priority number, date | FR20080055459 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: FR 0855459 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015673 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323829 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323829 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/20, B29C51/12, B29C65/02, B29C65/74, B60K15/03 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
B29C65/028 (EP,US);
B29C49/20 (EP,US);
B29C65/606 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/532 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/61 (EP,US);
B60K15/03177 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2008 (EP,US);
B29C2049/206 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2073 (EP,US);
B29C2049/4881 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C2791/007 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0063 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0081 (EP,US);
B29C48/0017 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/19 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/0691 (EP,US);
B29C49/06914 (EP,US);
B29C49/22 (EP,US);
B29C51/12 (EP,US);
B29C51/267 (EP,US);
B29C65/609 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/131 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/72341 (EP,US);
B29C66/72343 (EP,US);
B29K2021/003 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29K2023/065 (EP,US);
B29K2023/086 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0085 (EP,US);
B29K2223/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0069 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7172 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49956 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/003 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/086 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2061/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Befestigung eines Zubehörs an einem Kunststoffhohlkörper | [2012/07] | English: | Process for fastening an accessory to a plastic hollow body | [2012/07] | French: | Procédé de fixation d'un accessoire à un corps creux en plastique | [2012/07] |
Former [2011/21] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ZUBEHÖRS AN EINEM KUNSTSTOFFHOHLKÖRPER | ||
Former [2011/21] | PROCESS FOR FASTENING AN ACCESSORY TO A PLASTIC HOLLOW BODY | ||
Former [2011/21] | PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN ACCESSOIRE À UN CORPS CREUX EN PLASTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 26.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2009 | AT | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | HR | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MC | 10.10.2012 | MK | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | SM | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | NO | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MK | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10010900 (KRETH LUDWIG [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * figure 1; claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO2004024487 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XY]DE102006006469 (KAUTEX TEXTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0026] - [0029]; figures 1-12 * [Y] 2; | [A]US2008149642 (BORCHERT MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 9,10 * figures 1,4-10 * |