EP2329432 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CAB MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ben-Ari, Ronen P.O.Box 3176 47131 Ramat Hasharon / IL | For all designated states Levy, Amnon 37 Beit Hillel St. 47291 Ramat Hasharon / IL | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09804628.7 | 02.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009IB53353 | Priority number, date | US20080086169P | 05.08.2008 Original published format: US 86169 P | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010015984 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329432 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR FUHRPARKMANAGEMENT | [2011/23] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CAB MANAGEMENT | [2011/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE TAXI | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 04.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 56 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due tot heir notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion and the reference below. XP002456414 [L] 1-15 | International search | [A]US2003014286 (CAPPELLINI PABLO DARIO [GB]); | [Y]US2004039504 (COFFEE JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US2005187677 (WALKER RICHARD C [US]); | [X]US2006136254 (GREENSTEIN MARK [US]) |