EP2321955 - METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR REDUCING ARTIFACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMANEYES TECHNOLOGIES LTD. Hi-Tech Village 1-4 Edmond Safra Campus HUJI Givat Ram 91390 Jerusalem / IL | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOMET, Assaf 103/22 Herzl Boulevard 96344 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
LAU, Daniel L. 834 Spyglass Lane Lexington Kentucky / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 09804644.4 | 04.08.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009IL00761 | Priority number, date | US20080085893P | 04.08.2008 Original published format: US 85893 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010016061 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321955 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40, G02B27/22, G06T5/00, G02B27/00, H04N13/04 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G02B27/0018 (EP,US);
H04N1/40 (KR);
G02B30/27 (EP,US);
G06T5/73 (EP,US);
H04N1/04 (KR);
H04N1/387 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | H04N1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON ARTEFAKTEN | [2011/20] | English: | METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR REDUCING ARTIFACTS | [2011/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION DE PHÉNOMÈNES PARASITES | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 07.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1168060 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [I] 1-3,7,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0015] , [0017] , [0021] - [0028] * * figures 2-7 *; | [A]US6697171 (CARTER STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7,10-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 64 ** figures 2,4,5 * | International search | [Y]US6366281 (LIPTON LENNY [US], et al); | [Y]US7006709 (KANG SING BING [US], et al); | [Y]US7043074 (DARBEE PAUL V [US]); | [A]US2006227427 (DOLGOFF GENE [US]); | [Y]WO2008087632 (HUMANEYES TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) |