EP2323141 - SUPERCONDUCTING COIL ASSEMBLY AND MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/20] | SUPERCONDUCTING COIL AND MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATOR | ||
[2013/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAYA, Atsuko c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 02 /
OOTA, Tomoya c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMOTO, Hidehiko c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION UNIVERSITY OF FUKUI 9-1 Bunkyo 3-chome Fukui-shi Fukui 910-8507 / JP | [2014/21] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
FUKAYA, Atsuko c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | ||
02 /
OOTA, Tomoya c/o IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | |||
03 /
SUGIMOTO, Hidehiko c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION UNIVERSITY OF FUKUI 9-1 Bunkyo 3-chome Fukui-shi Fukui 910-8507 / JP | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09804741.8 | 05.08.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009JP03756 | Priority number, date | JP20080202807 | 06.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008202807 | [2011/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010016254 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323141 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323141 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01F6/06, H01F6/00, H01F7/20 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H01F6/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01F6/06 (KR);
H01F7/202 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | H01F6/06, H01F6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | SUPRALEITENDE SPULENANORDNUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES MAGNETFELDES | [2013/49] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTING COIL ASSEMBLY AND MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATING EQUIPMENT | [2013/49] | French: | BOBINES SUPRACONDUCTRICES ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE GÉNÉRATION DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2013/49] |
Former [2011/20] | SUPRALEITENDE SPULE UND MAGNETFELDERZEUGER | ||
Former [2011/20] | SUPERCONDUCTING COIL AND MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATOR | ||
Former [2011/20] | BOBINE SUPRACONDUCTICE ET GÉNÉRATEUR DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2011 | Translation filed | 18.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 25.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2009 | AT | 21.05.2014 | BE | 21.05.2014 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | ES | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | HR | 21.05.2014 | IT | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MK | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | NL | 21.05.2014 | PL | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | SM | 21.05.2014 | TR | 21.05.2014 | IE | 05.08.2014 | LU | 05.08.2014 | GB | 21.08.2014 | NO | 21.08.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
GB | 21.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]JP2004342972 (KYUSHU ELECTRIC POWER, et al) [XD] 1,2,4,6 * paragraphs [(0017] , [ 0023] , [ 0033] , [ 0037] , [ 0051] * [Y] 3 [I] 1; | [XYI]JPH07142245 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * [Y] 3 [I] 1,2; | [Y]WO9612288 (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 3 * page 3, lines 13 - 21 * * page 9, lines 6-18 * * figures 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]JP2004342972 (KYUSHU ELECTRIC POWER, et al); | [Y]JPH07142245 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2005510997 (SIEMENS AG.); | [Y]JPH05144628 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2007060748 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2001006920 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2003158009 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [A]JP2005191539 (NEXANS) | by applicant | JP2008202807 | JP2004342972 |