EP2311304 - MOWER WITH VERSATILE OPERATING ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO Ryosuke c/o Makita Corporation 11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09806615.2 | 06.07.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009JP62281 | Priority number, date | JP20080206927 | 11.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008206927 | [2011/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010018719 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311304 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/90 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
A01D34/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | A01D34/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | RASENMÄHER MIT VIELSEITIGER BETÄTIGUNGSSTANGE | [2011/16] | English: | MOWER WITH VERSATILE OPERATING ROD | [2011/16] | French: | TONDEUSE À TRINGLE DE COMMANDE POLYVALENTE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2011 | Translation filed | 01.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 06.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007044321 (KOCHA MASAHARU [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0029] ** figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPS6422220U (FUJI ROBIN INDUSTRIES LTD.); | [Y]JPH03119916 (COSMO SAAKURU KK); | [Y]JPH0399919U (FUJI ROBIN INDUSTRIES LTD.); | [Y]JPH0563225U (ISHIKAWAJIMA-SHIBAURA MACHINERY CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2006109776 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) | Examination | EP1606986 | by applicant | JP2006311828 | JP2008206927 |