EP2315539 - DUAL SIDED COSMETIC BRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anisa International, Inc. 55 Peachtree Park Drive, NE Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TELWAR, Anisa 55 Peachtree Park Drive, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Chettle, Adrian John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/18] | Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09806937.0 | 03.08.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009US04449 | Priority number, date | US20080188754P | 12.08.2008 Original published format: US 188754 P | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010019191 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2315539 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A45D33/00, A45D40/00, A46B9/06, A46B9/02, A46B3/08, A46D1/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A45D40/26 (KR);
A45D33/00 (KR);
A45D34/04 (KR);
A46B3/08 (EP,US);
A46D1/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | A45D33/00, A45D40/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | ZWEISEITIGE KOSMETISCHE BÜRSTE | [2011/18] | English: | DUAL SIDED COSMETIC BRUSH | [2011/18] | French: | PINCEAU DE MAQUILLAGE DOUBLE | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 10.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 11.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008169002 (HWANG JAE KWANG [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0045] * * figures 2-5 * [I] 3,4,11; | [XI]JPS6147917U (-) [X] 1,3,9 * figure - * [I] 2,4-8,10-15 | International search | [X]JP2006075329 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]US2008141479 (MINK JEFFREY [US]); | [A]US2007177930 (BYUN YOUNG-CHUL [KR]); | [A]US2002078902 (EHRMANN DOUGLAS G [US]) | by applicant | US2008169002 | JPS6147917U |