EP2316078 - MESSAGING APPLICATION WITH MULTIPLE VIEWPORTS FOR PRESENTING MESSAGES IN DIFFERENT ORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYERS, Eric, B. 2273 Beckham Way Hayward CA 94541 / US | 02 /
HUDSON, Douglas, T. 5 Keats Drive Bayville NJ 08721 / US | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
MAYERS, Eric, B. 2273 Beckham Way Hayward CA 94541 / US | ||
02 /
HUDSON, Douglas, T. 40 Ridgewood Drive Toms River NJ 08755 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09807109.5 | 07.08.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009US53164 | Priority number, date | US20080192055 | 14.08.2008 Original published format: US 192055 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010019474 | Date: | 18.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2316078 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, H04L12/58, H04M3/533 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H04M3/53333 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
H04L51/00 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
H04M3/533 (US);
H04M3/5335 (EP);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04M2201/12 (EP,US);
H04M2201/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | BENACHRICHTIGUNGSANWENDUNG MIT MEHREREN ANSICHTSFENSTERN ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON BENACHRICHTIGUNGEN IN VERSCHIEDENER REIHENFOLGE | [2011/18] | English: | MESSAGING APPLICATION WITH MULTIPLE VIEWPORTS FOR PRESENTING MESSAGES IN DIFFERENT ORDERS | [2011/18] | French: | APPLICATION DE MESSAGERIE À MULTIFENÊTRAGE POUR PRÉSENTER DES MESSAGES DANS DIFFÉRENTS ORDRES | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 05.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Dennis Quan ET AL, "A Unified Abstraction for Messaging on the Semantic Web", Cambridge, MA, USA, (20030101), URL: http://reference.kfupm.edu.sa/content/u/n/a_unified_abstraction_for_messaging_on_t_93194.pdf, (20121029), XP055042490 [I] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2002055940 (ELKAN CHARLES [US]); | [Y]US2005204001 (STEIN TZVI [IL], et al); | [Y]US2006031340 (MATHEW BOBAN [US], et al) | Examination | US2006010217 | by applicant | US2002055940 | US2005204001 | US2006031340 |