Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011072628 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8770395 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2014 | B2 | US2013164102 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8567588 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2013146423 | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5643333B | Global Dossier | 17.12.2014 | B2 | JP2013513532 | 22.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2450306 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2013 | B1 | EP2450306 | 09.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09807436 | 14.12.2009 | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2396269 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2012 | B1 | EP2396269 | 21.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012014319 | 05.07.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012023169 | 09.04.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2399015T | 25.03.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2440642T | 29.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2396269T | 31.05.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09807436 | 14.12.2009 | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2450306T | 30.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09807436 | 14.12.2009 | EP12000072 | 14.12.2009 | WO2009DE01752 | 14.12.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP2450306 |