Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012015322 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5873334B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2016 | B2 | JP2012513455 | 14.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009332708 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2376018 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923558 | 26.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2747282 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102316822 | 11.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0823435D0 | 28.01.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0904164D0 | 22.04.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX336702 | 28.01.2016 | B | MX2011006733 | 11.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2559932 | 20.08.2015 | C2 | RU2011130804 | 27.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG172205 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201104045 | 29.02.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009GB02909 | 17.12.2009 | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010072997 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110114596 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016019755 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0823435 | 23.12.2008 | GB0904164 | 11.03.2009 |