EP2376018 - COSMETIC TEETH WHITENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The BOC Group Limited The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVERY, Cormac, John The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7XY / GB | 02 /
LLYOD, Geoffrey, Morgan The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7XY / GB | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Christie, Gemma Louise, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | ||
Former [2011/42] | Wickham, Michael The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road, The Surrey Research Park GB-Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09807547.6 | 17.12.2009 | WO2009GB02909 | Priority number, date | GB20080023435 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0823435 | GB20090004164 | 11.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0904164 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072997 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376018 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/06 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A61C19/063 (EP,US);
A61C19/06 (KR);
A61C19/066 (EP,US);
A61N1/44 (KR);
A61N5/10 (KR);
A61C17/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZAHNAUFHELLUNG | [2011/42] | English: | COSMETIC TEETH WHITENING | [2011/42] | French: | BLANCHIMENT COSMÉTIQUE DES DENTS | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 12.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 25.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/42] | 04.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US2009004620 (LIU CHI-HUNG [TW], et al) [XP] 17 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0016] , [0017]; claims 1-2 *; | [XY]EP1974691 (KREBBER BURGHARDT [DE]) [X] 17 * column 4, paragraphs 19-21; claim 1 * [Y] 17; | [YD]US2003082500 (LYNCH EDWARD [GB]) [YD] 17 * paragraph [0023] * | Examination | US2007029500 | WO2006096716 | by applicant | US6770266 | US6569408 | US6555020 | US2003082500 | WO2006096716 | WO2004016052 | WO2006096718 | - JAMES L WALSH ET AL., "Atmospheric Dielectric-Barrier Discharges Scalable from 1 mm to 1 m", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PLASMA SCIENCE, (200808), vol. 36, no. 4 |