|
06.11.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Letter relating to refund instructions (deposit account) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
23 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |