Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011076289 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP67928 | 24.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8755553 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2014 | B2 | US2012269373 | 25.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP67928 | 24.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2517476 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP67928 | 24.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102763431B | 19.08.2015 | B | CN102763431 | 31.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP67928 | 24.12.2009 |