EP2320747 - PREPARATION OF CANOLA PROTEIN ISOLATE FROM CANOLA OIL SEEDS ("BLENDERTEIN") [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burcon NutraScience (MB) Corp. 1388 Waller Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 1P9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Burcon Nutrascience (MB) Corp. 1388 Waller Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 1P9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEGALL, Kevin I. 31 Dunbar Crescent Winnipeg, Manitoba R3P 0W6 / CA | 02 /
GREEN, Brent E. 24 Poplarwood Drive Box 603 Warren Manitoba Canada R0C 3E0 / CA | 03 /
SCHWEIZER, Martin 117 Haig Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R2M 0E3 / CA | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
SEGALL, Kevin I. 31 Dunbar Crescent Winnipeg, Manitoba R3P 0W6 / CA | ||
02 /
GREEN, Brent E. 24 Poplarwood Drive Winnipeg, Manitoba R0C 3E0 / CA | |||
03 /
SCHWEIZER, Martin 117 Haig Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R2M 0E3 / CA | Representative(s) | Selden, Deborah Anne Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Selden, Deborah Anne Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09807782.9 | 18.08.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009CA01148 | Priority number, date | US20080136192P | 18.08.2008 Original published format: US 136192 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010020039 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320747 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/14, A23J3/14, A23K1/14, A23L1/305, C07K1/14, C07K14/415 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
A23J1/14 (KR);
C07K1/36 (US);
A23J3/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Extension states | AL | 04.03.2011 | BA | 04.03.2011 | RS | 04.03.2011 | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG EINES RAPSPROTEINISOLATS AUS RAPSÖLSAMEN (BLENDERTEIN) | [2011/20] | English: | PREPARATION OF CANOLA PROTEIN ISOLATE FROM CANOLA OIL SEEDS ("BLENDERTEIN") | [2011/20] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'ISOLAT DE PROTÉINES DE CANOLA À PARTIR DE GRAINES OLÉAGINEUSES DE CANOLA ("BLENDERTEIN") | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 09.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9727761 (B M W CANOLA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,8-10; | [A]WO2004000031 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004077838 (GREEN BRENT E [CA], et al) [Y] 3,5,8-10 * abstract *; | [A] - LAMIA L'HOCINE ET AL, "Composition and Functional Properties of Soy Protein Isolates Prepared Using Alternative Defatting and Extraction Procedures", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (20060430), vol. 71, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2006.tb15609.x, ISSN 0022-1147, pages C137 - C145, XP055088855 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2006.tb15609.x | International search | [A]CA1100490 (CANADA AGRICULTURE); | [X]US5844086 (MURRAY EDWARD DONALD [CA]); | [X]US6005076 (MURRAY EDWARD D [CA]); | [Y]WO02089597 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA], et al); | [A]CA2467746 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA]); | [Y]WO03053157 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA], et al); | [A]CA2481936 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA]); | [Y]CA2489505 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA]); | [A]CA2488848 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA]); | [Y]CA2556711 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA]); | [Y]CA2564400 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA]) |