EP2317655 - PARALLEL-SERIAL CONVERTER FOR OPTICAL TRANSMISSION, OPTICAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOSAKA, Tetsuya c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
HAMANA, Kentaro c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
YASUDA, Naru c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 04 /
HOSOKAWA, Hayami c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
NOSAKA, Tetsuya c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMANA, Kentaro c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
YASUDA, Naru c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
04 /
HOSOKAWA, Hayami c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Giovannini, Francesca Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Giovannini, Francesca Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/18] | Giovannini, Francesca Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09808100.3 | 25.02.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009JP53438 | Priority number, date | JP20080214605 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008214605 | [2011/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010021164 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2317655 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2317655 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/80, H04L25/00, G02B6/43, H03M9/00 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
G02B6/43 (EP,US);
H03M9/00 (EP,US);
H04B10/801 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | H03M9/00, G02B6/42, H04B10/00, G02B6/43 | ||
Former IPC [2011/18] | H03M9/00, G02B6/42, H04B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | PARALLEL-IN-SERIELL-UMWANDLER FÜR OPTISCHE ÜBERTRAGUNGEN, OPTISCHES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2011/18] | English: | PARALLEL-SERIAL CONVERTER FOR OPTICAL TRANSMISSION, OPTICAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2011/18] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR PARALLÈLE/SÉRIE POUR UNE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE, SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2010 | Translation filed | 24.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 09.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2013 | 20.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2009 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JP2005064888 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1,14,17 * the whole document * [A] 2 [Y] 10,15,16 [I] 3-9; | [XA]JP2005311523 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) [X] 1,14,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0029] * [A] 2-13,15,16; | [Y]JP2001268039 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 10,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0039]; claim 1 *; | [Y]JP2006114987 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0057] *; | [AD]JP2001230678 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [AD] 1-17 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2005064888 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [X]JP2005311523 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001268039 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2006114987 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | Examination | US6081360 | US2007133663 | by applicant | JP2001230678 |