EP2324914 - CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PYROLYSIS OF ORGANIC SUBSTANCES AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 5-2, Ebisujima-cho Sakai-ku Sakai Osaka 590-8502 / JP | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 1-23, Ebisunocho-nishi 1-chome Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASATSUGU, Mitsuru c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 1 Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | 02 /
UMABA, Toshikatsu c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 1 Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | 03 /
KASHIMOTO, Itsushi c/o KUSATSU ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 3-38 Higashikusatsu 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Siga 525-8501 / JP | [2015/38] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
MASATSUGU, Mitsuru c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 1 Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | ||
02 /
UMABA, Toshikatsu c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 1 Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | |||
03 /
KASHIMOTO, Itsushi c/o KUSATSU ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 3-38 Higashikusatsu 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Siga 525-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/21] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09808332.2 | 18.08.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009JP64689 | Priority number, date | JP20080211286 | 20.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008211286 | [2011/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010021397 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2324914 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2324914 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/06, B01J23/30, B01J35/10, B01J37/00, B01J37/04, B01J37/08, C08J11/16, C10B53/07, C10B57/06, F23C13/08, F23G7/07, C01G23/053, C01G23/08, C10G1/10, B01J37/03, B01J35/00, C08J11/02, C10G1/08, B01J35/02, C08J11/12 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
C08J11/12 (EP,CN,US);
B01J21/06 (KR);
B01J23/30 (CN,KR);
B01J21/063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J21/066 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/31 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/60 (KR);
B01J35/613 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/0045 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/036 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/08 (KR);
C01G23/08 (EP,US);
C10B53/07 (EP,CN,US);
C10B57/06 (EP,CN,US);
C10G1/086 (EP,CN,US);
C10G1/10 (EP,CN,US);
F23C13/08 (EP,CN,US);
F23G7/07 (EP,CN,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C08J2323/04 (EP,CN,US);
F23G2900/50202 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | B01J21/06, B01J23/30, B01J35/10, B01J37/00, B01J37/04, B01J37/08, C08J11/16, C10B53/07, C10B57/06, F23C13/08, F23G7/07, C01G23/053, C01G23/08 | ||
Former IPC [2011/21] | B01J21/06, B01J23/30, B01J35/10, B01J37/00, B01J37/04, B01J37/08, C08J11/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2011/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR PYROLYSE ORGANISCHER STOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DERARTIGEN KATALYSATORS | [2011/21] | English: | CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PYROLYSIS OF ORGANIC SUBSTANCES AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH CATALYST | [2011/21] | French: | CATALYSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PYROLYSE DE SUBSTANCES ORGANIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D UN TEL CATALYSEUR | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2011 | Translation filed | 11.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 05.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2009 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | IE | 18.08.2016 | LU | 18.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.08.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.08.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005205312 ; | [A]JP2005187794 ; | International search | [Y]JPS5344431B ; | [Y]JPS5935026 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [Y]JPS6445726U ; | [A]JPH05192583 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK); | [Y]JPH0952052 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [Y]JP2003528937 ; | [Y]JP2005139440 (MIZUGUCHI HITOSHI); | [Y]JP2005169293 (OSADA GIKEN CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2005307007 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO, et al); | [Y]WO2007122967 (KUSATSU ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002363337 | JP2005306697 | JP2005307007 |