EP2321449 - METHOD FOR REMOVING BRAZING RESIDUES FROM ALUMINUM ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation Carrier World Headquarters One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation Carrier World Headquarters One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAWOROWSKI, Mark, R. 64 Uplands Way Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
ESFORMES, Jack, Leon 5896 Invincible Drive Jamesville, NY 13078 / US | 03 /
MAGDEFRAU, Neal 47 Kate Lane Tolland, CT 06084 / US | 04 /
TARAS, Michael, F. 5424 Springview Drive Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2017/27] |
Former [2011/20] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09808541.8 | 01.05.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009US42552 | Priority number, date | US20080089585P | 18.08.2008 Original published format: US 89585 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010021769 | Date: | 25.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2321449 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2321449 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C25F1/04, C23G1/24, C23G5/00 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C23G1/24 (EP,US);
C23G5/00 (EP,US);
C25F1/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | C25F1/02, C25F3/20, C23F1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON LÖTSPUREN BEI ALUMINIUMARTIKELN | [2011/20] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING BRAZING RESIDUES FROM ALUMINUM ARTICLES | [2011/20] | French: | TECHNIQUE D'ÉLIMINATION DE RÉSIDUS DE BRASURE SUR DES ARTICLES EN ALUMINIUM | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 01.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.05.2009 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 01.05.2009 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3074824 (BINGER WAYNE W, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 18 * [Y] 10-14 [I] 4-9,15; | [XYI]US4643348 (TAKAHASHI SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 1-3 * example 1 * [Y] 10-14 [I] 4-8,15; | [A]JPS6264471 (FURUKAWA ALUMINIUM) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y] - WATSON JR CA, "CATHODIC CLEANING REMOVES FLUX FROM FURNACE BRAZED ALUMINUM ASSEMBLIES", WELDING JOURNAL, AMERICAN WELDING SOCIETY, MIAMI, FL, US, (19690901), vol. 48, no. 9, ISSN 0043-2296, pages 721 - 725, XP009180177 [Y] 10-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP0263592 (OTUKA ET AL.); | [A]JP2002538965 (NORSK HYDRO ASA); | [A]US6994919 (WIJENBERG JACQUES HUBERT OLGA [NL], et al); | [A]US7347353 (YAMAKOSHI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3074824 | JPS6264471 |