EP2319230 - SHELL FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byd Company Limited No. 3001, Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Hongzhen No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
CHANG, Mingzhu No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jiaxin No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
DENG, Taoyong No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
GAO, Xiaoqing No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09809236.4 | 25.08.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009CN73504 | Priority number, date | CN20081210899 | 25.08.2008 Original published format: CN200810210899 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010022651 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319230 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/46, B29C70/76, B29C43/20, // B29K707/04, B29L31/34, B29K101/10, B29K105/24 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
B29C43/203 (EP,US);
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29C70/763 (EP,US);
B29K2101/10 (EP,US);
B29K2105/243 (EP,US);
B29K2105/256 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | H04M1/00, B29C43/18, B29C43/20 | ||
Former IPC [2011/19] | H04M1/00, B29C43/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/19] | English: | SHELL FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SAME | [2011/19] | French: | COQUE POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1119155 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 2-9,11,12; | [I]US2003182896 (BIENICK CRAIG [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figures 5-14 ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]EP1535726 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1,3-9,11,12 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0064] *; | [A]EP1631857 (SIPIX IMAGING INC [US]) [A] 1,3-9,11,12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-2b * | International search | [Y]WO2004018186 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2005002305 (SIPIX IMAGING INC [US]); | [X]CN2842995Y (HECHENG XINYE CO LTD [CN]) |