Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011149172 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101241620B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2013 | B1 | KR20110063772 | 14.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5220863B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2013 | B2 | JPWO2010024059 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | JP2010526627 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2322983 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | A4 | EP2322983 | 18.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0917158 | 17.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102132203B | 07.05.2014 | B | CN102132203 | 20.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2478225 | 27.03.2013 | C2 | RU2011111082 | 27.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009JP62826 | 15.07.2009 | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010024059 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008218832 | 27.08.2008 |