EP2322983 - ACTIVE MATRIX SUBSTRATE, LIQUID CRYSTAL PANEL, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY UNIT, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY, TELEVISION RECEIVER, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ACTIVE MATRIX SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUBATA, Toshihide c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09809714.0 | 15.07.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009JP62826 | Priority number, date | JP20080218832 | 27.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008218832 | [2011/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010024059 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322983 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1368, G02F1/1362 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
G02F1/136213 (EP,US);
G02F1/1368 (KR);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/1343 (KR);
G02F1/13624 (EP,US);
G02F1/136259 (EP,US);
G02F1/134345 (EP,US);
G02F1/134354 (EP,US);
G02F1/13606 (EP,US);
G02F1/136227 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | G02F1/1368 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | AKTIVMATRIXSUBSTRAT, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLTAFEL, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEEINHEIT, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE, FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES AKTIVMATRIXSUBSTRATS | [2011/20] | English: | ACTIVE MATRIX SUBSTRATE, LIQUID CRYSTAL PANEL, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY UNIT, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY, TELEVISION RECEIVER, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ACTIVE MATRIX SUBSTRATE | [2011/20] | French: | SUBSTRAT À MATRICE ACTIVE, PANNEAU À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, UNITÉ D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, POSTE DE TÉLÉVISION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU SUBSTRAT À MATRICE ACTIVE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2011 | Translation filed | 02.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 15.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005162893 (YAGI TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,12,13,17 * paragraphs [0084] - [0097] - [0110] - [0118]; figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 5,8; | [Y]WO2007108181 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 5,8 * paragraphs [0054] - [0082] - [0122] - [0127]; figures 2,6 *; | EP1998220 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0054] - [0082] - [0122] - [0127]; figures 2,6 * | International search | [Y]JPH0667210 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [Y]JPH09236825 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [Y]JP2006039290 (FUJITSU DISPLAY TECH, et al); | [Y]WO2006064832 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007108181 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2008097009 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006039290 |