EP2316654 - LIQUID EJECTION HEAD, CARRIAGE UNIT, PRESSURE CONTROL METHOD, AND LIQUID EJECTION RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SII Printek Inc 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states SII Printek Inc 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | ||
For all designated states Roland DG Corporation 1-6-4 Shinmiyakoda Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASE, Fumiyoshi c/o Roland DG Corporation 1-6-4 Shinmiyakoda Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | 02 /
MURASE, Tetsuya c/o SII PRINTEK INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 03 /
TODA, Masatoshi c/o SII PRINTEK INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street GB-London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street GB-London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 09809738.9 | 29.07.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009JP63519 | Priority number, date | JP20080221649 | 29.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008221649 | [2011/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010024084 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316654 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/17566 (US);
B41J2/045 (KR);
B41J2/17596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSKOPF, WAGENEINHEIT, DRUCKSTEUERUNGSVERRFAHREN UND FLÜSSGKEITSAUSSTOSS-AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/18] | English: | LIQUID EJECTION HEAD, CARRIAGE UNIT, PRESSURE CONTROL METHOD, AND LIQUID EJECTION RECORDING DEVICE | [2011/18] | French: | TÊTE D ÉJECTION DE LIQUIDE, UNITÉ DE CHARIOT, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE PRESSION ET DISPOSITIF D IMPRESSION À ÉJECTION DE LIQUIDE | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2011 | Translation filed | 21.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0584922 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH1034899 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2000343723 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2002241653 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2006021383 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC); | [Y]JP2007203641 (CANON FINETECH INC); | [Y]JP2008188854 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2005034999 |